US HB777 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-104. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-104. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes grants that support state and local efforts to process DNA evidence in rape kits. Specifically, it reauthorizes through FY2024 the following: grants under the Debbie Smith DNA Backlog Grant Program; grants to provide DNA training and education for law enforcement personnel, corrections personnel, and court officers; and grants under the Sexual Assault Forensic Exam Program.
Title
Debbie Smith Reauthorization Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] |
Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] |
Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] |
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] |
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2019-10-23 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 584 (Y: 402 N: 1 NV: 28 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-30 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-104. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-12-30 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-12-20 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-12-17 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7084) |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2019-10-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 1 (Roll no. 584). (text: CR H8404) |
2019-10-23 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8442-8443) |
2019-10-23 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-10-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 777. |
2019-10-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8403-8409) |
2019-10-23 | House | Mr. Nadler moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB820 (Related) 2019-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Subjects
Assault and harassment offenses
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Evidence and witnesses
Genetics
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Sex offenses
Violent crime
Crime and law enforcement
Crimes against women
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Evidence and witnesses
Genetics
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Sex offenses
Violent crime