US HB7804 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-1)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a grants program for licensed child care providers that were in continuous operation immediately prior to March 1, 2020, to pay for specified fixed costs and operating expenses for a period of not more than nine months.
Title
Back to Work Child Care Grants Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] | Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] |
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA] | Rep. French Hill [R-AR] |
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] |
Rep. Harold Rogers [R-KY] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA] | Rep. Mike Garcia [R-CA] |
Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] |
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2020-07-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4221 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4322 (Related) 2020-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4775 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 564.
SB4322 (Related) 2020-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4775 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 564.
Subjects
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child care and development
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Families
Government information and archives
Health technology, devices, supplies
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
State and local government operations
Worker safety and health
Child care and development
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Families
Government information and archives
Health technology, devices, supplies
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
State and local government operations
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7804/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7804/BILLS-116hr7804ih.pdf |