US HB7806 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 152-23)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Small Business Administration (SBA) to make grants to eligible live venue operators, producers, promoters, or talent representatives to address the economic effects of the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) pandemic on certain live venues. Specifically, the SBA may make (1) an initial grant of up to $12 million dollars to an eligible operator, promoter, producer, or talent representative; and (2) a supplemental grant that is equal to 50% of the initial grant. An initial grant must be used for costs incurred between March 1, 2020, and December 31, 2020, but a supplemental grant may be used for expenses incurred through June 30, 2021. Such grants shall be used for specified expenses such as payroll costs, rent, utilities, and personal protective equipment.
Title
SOS Act Save our Stages Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2020-07-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4258 (Same As) 2020-07-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
SB4818 (Related) 2020-12-10 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
SB4818 (Related) 2020-12-10 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
Business expenses
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commerce
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Music
Performing arts
Small business
Wages and earnings
Worker safety and health
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Commerce
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health technology, devices, supplies
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Music
Performing arts
Small business
Wages and earnings
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7806/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7806/BILLS-116hr7806ih.pdf |