US HB7843 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Introduced on July 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Forest and Rangeland Renewable Resources Planning Act of 1974 to promote reforestation following unplanned events on Federal land, and for other purposes.
Title
REPLANT Act Repairing Existing Public Lands by Adding Necessary Trees Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] | Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2020-08-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2020-07-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-07-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3106 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB4357 (Same As) 2020-07-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB4357 (Same As) 2020-07-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Agricultural practices and innovations
Air quality
Animal and plant health
Atmospheric science and weather
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Ecology
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Government trust funds
Insects
Intergovernmental relations
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Pest management
Public contracts and procurement
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
State and local government operations
Water quality
Watersheds
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Agricultural practices and innovations
Air quality
Animal and plant health
Atmospheric science and weather
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Ecology
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Government trust funds
Insects
Intergovernmental relations
Land use and conservation
Outdoor recreation
Pest management
Public contracts and procurement
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
State and local government operations
Water quality
Watersheds
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7843/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7843/BILLS-116hr7843ih.pdf |