US HB788 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions regarding shark conservation and fishery management. The bill requires any country that seeks to import shark products into the United States to obtain a certification from the Department of Commerce that the country has a regulatory program in effect to provide for the conservation and management of sharks, including measures to prohibit the removal of any of the fins of a shark (including the tail). Commerce must revise its regulations to include rays and skates as species that are subject to the Seafood Traceability Program. (The Seafood Traceability Program has data reporting and recordkeeping requirements at the time of entry for imported fish or fish products entered into U.S. commerce.)
Title
Sustainable Shark Fisheries and Trade Act
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] |
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] |
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] |
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL] | Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] |
Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1008 (Related) 2019-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Agricultural trade
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Animals
Fishes
Hunting and fishing
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Seafood
Trade restrictions
Agricultural trade
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Animals
Fishes
Hunting and fishing
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Seafood
Trade restrictions
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/788/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr788/BILLS-116hr788ih.pdf |