US HB7882 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-30 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-30 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permanently authorizes and restores into effect the Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Act (ACPERA) of 2004. ACPERA, which expired on June 22, 2020, provides incentives (e.g., limitations on civil liability) for corporations to self-report criminal conduct to the Antitrust Division within the Department of Justice.
Title
Antitrust Criminal Penalty Enhancement and Reform Permanent Extension Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-07-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7036 (Related) 2020-06-29 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 486.
SB3377 (Related) 2020-06-29 - Held at the desk.
SB4346 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Held at the desk.
HB8319 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Rule H. Res. 1129 passed House.
HR1129 (Similar To) 2020-09-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8337 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-159. (TXT | PDF)
SB3377 (Related) 2020-06-29 - Held at the desk.
SB4346 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Held at the desk.
HB8319 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Rule H. Res. 1129 passed House.
HR1129 (Similar To) 2020-09-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8337 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-159. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Competition and antitrust
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Competition and antitrust
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7882/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7882/BILLS-116hr7882ih.pdf |