US HB7907 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-31 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-31 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the National Criminal Justice Commission. The commission must conduct a comprehensive review of the criminal justice system; make recommendations for criminal justice reform; and disseminate findings and guidance to the federal government and to state, local, and tribal governments.
Title
National Criminal Justice Commission Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-07-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7278 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB2434 (Related) 2019-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3985 (Related) 2021-01-01 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S7995)
SB2434 (Related) 2019-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3985 (Related) 2021-01-01 - Motion to proceed to consideration of measure made in Senate. (CR S7995)
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Judicial procedure and administration
Law enforcement administration and funding
Violent crime
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Judicial procedure and administration
Law enforcement administration and funding
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/7907/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr7907/BILLS-116hr7907ih.pdf |