US HB7948 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Pending: Senate Indian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Pending: Senate Indian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expands tribal access to public health care data and public health surveillance programs. It also reauthorizes through FY2025 the National Center for Health Statistics, which is part of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC), and requires the CDC to take certain actions to address the collection and availability of health data for American Indians and Alaska Natives. Specifically, the Department of Health and Human Services must, within 30 days, make available all data related to health care and public health surveillance programs and activities to the Indian Health Service, Indian tribes, and tribal epidemiology centers. The CDC must make grants to and enter into contracts with tribes and tribal epidemiology centers for data collection and related activities. It must also provide technical assistance. In addition, the CDC must (1) develop guidelines for state and local health agencies to improve birth and death record data for American Indians and Alaska Natives; (2) enter into cooperative agreements with tribes, tribal organizations, urban Indian organizations, and tribal epidemiology centers to address certain inaccuracies related to records for American Indians and Alaska Natives; and (3) encourage states to enter into data sharing agreement with tribes and tribal epidemiology centers to improve the quality and accuracy of health data.
Title
Tribal Health Data Improvement Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] |
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
2020-09-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5010-5011) |
2020-09-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7948. |
2020-09-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5010-5012) |
2020-09-29 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 446. |
2020-09-29 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-546. |
2020-09-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-08-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-08-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4562 (Related) 2020-09-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Census and government statistics
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Intergovernmental relations
Minority health
Native Americans
Census and government statistics
Federal-Indian relations
Government information and archives
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Intergovernmental relations
Minority health
Native Americans