US HB7954 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extends through FY2025 authority for debt-for-nature swaps and debt buyback programs that reduce or convert debt obligations from eligible countries to the United States into funding for nature conservation and protection efforts in that country.
Title
Tropical Forest and Coral Reef Conservation Reauthorization Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] |
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2020-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5922) |
2020-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7954. |
2020-11-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5922-5923) |
2020-11-18 | House | Mr. Espaillat moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-10-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-10-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-08-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2020-08-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4428 (Same As) 2020-08-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Aquatic ecology
Ecology
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign loans and debt
Forests, forestry, trees
Government lending and loan guarantees
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Ecology
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign loans and debt
Forests, forestry, trees
Government lending and loan guarantees
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Land use and conservation
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection