US HB7990 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-9)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates two programs, establishes a reporting requirement, and otherwise modifies provisions to facilitate global cooperation against synthetic drug trafficking. Specifically, the bill requires the Department of State to establish a program to provide capacity-building assistance for law enforcement agencies of specified countries to identify, track, and detect certain synthetic drugs (e.g., fentanyl). The State Department must also carry out an international exchange program for drug demand reduction experts to provide educational and professional development on demand-reduction matters relating to the illicit use of narcotics and other drugs. The bill requires the State Department to include new sections in its annual international narcotics control strategy report that contain (1) an assessment of the countries significantly involved in the trafficking of synthetic opioids; and (2) policies of responding to new psychoactive substances. The bill also expands the definition of major illicit drug producing country to include countries that produce synthetic drugs. Under current law, foreign assistance may be withheld from such countries.
Title
FENTANYL Results Act Fighting Emerging Narcotics Through Additional Nations to Yield Lasting Results Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] | Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] |
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA] |
Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI] |
Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA] |
Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] |
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2020-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5893-5894) |
2020-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 7990. |
2020-11-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5893-5895) |
2020-11-18 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-10-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-10-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-08-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2020-08-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4514 (Related) 2020-08-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Cultural exchanges and relations
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employment and training programs
Foreign aid and international relief
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International organizations and cooperation
Law enforcement administration and funding
Smuggling and trafficking
United Nations
Cultural exchanges and relations
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employment and training programs
Foreign aid and international relief
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International organizations and cooperation
Law enforcement administration and funding
Smuggling and trafficking
United Nations