US HB7992 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Telehealth Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telehealth Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-06HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2020-08-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-08-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-08-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-08-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-08-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB3228 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 553.
HB4900 (Related) 2019-10-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5473 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB7187 (Related) 2020-06-11 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB7233 (Related) 2020-06-18 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB7338 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB7593 (Related) 2020-07-13 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB2408 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB3988 (Related) 2020-06-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4039 (Related) 2020-06-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4103 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4216 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB3643 (Related) 2020-09-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 545.

Subjects

Aging
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Child health
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Home and outpatient care
Income tax deductions
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Internet and video services
Licensing and registrations
Medicaid
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Mental health
Minority health
Prescription drugs
Right of privacy
Rural conditions and development
Telephone and wireless communication
Veterans' medical care

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback