US HB806 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-10)
Status: Engrossed on September 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Portable Fuel Container Safety Act of 2019 This bill directs the Consumer Product Safety Commission (CPSC) to require fuel containers to include devices that impede flames from entering the container. This requirement applies to flammable, liquid fuel containers of fewer than five gallons that are intended for transport. CPSC may either promulgate a rule or adopt an existing standard. Additionally, CPSC must educate consumers about dangers associated with using or storing such containers near an open flame or a source of ignition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Portable Fuel Container Safety Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-18SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
2019-09-17HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-09-17HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7727-7728)
2019-09-17HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 806.
2019-09-17HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7727-7729)
2019-09-17HouseMs. Schakowsky moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-09-13HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 164.
2019-09-13HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-207.
2019-07-17HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-07-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-07-10HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2019-07-10HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-13HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-01-29HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-01-28HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1640 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback