US HB8075 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Introduced on August 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-21 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
Pending: House Education and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows local educational agencies (LEAs) participating in the Impact Aid Program to use the student count and federal property valuation data from their FY2021 program applications for their FY2022 program applications. The program provides funding to LEAs that have lost property tax revenue due to the presence of tax-exempt federal property or to those that have experienced increased expenditures due to enrollment of federally connected children (e.g., children living on Indian lands or military bases).
Title
Impact Aid Coronavirus Relief Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] |
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] |
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] |
Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2020-08-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4063 (Same As) 2020-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S3209)
SB4322 (Related) 2020-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB8472 (Related) 2020-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-211. (TXT | PDF)
SB4322 (Related) 2020-07-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB8472 (Related) 2020-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-211. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Property tax
State and local taxation
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Property tax
State and local taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8075/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8075/BILLS-116hr8075ih.pdf |