US HB8098 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on August 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-25 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-25 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To address hospital consolidation and promote hospital price transparency, and for other purposes.
Title
Hospital Competition Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3062 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB6005 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SB1688 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2860 (Related) 2019-11-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4796 (Related) 2020-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8527 (Related) 2020-10-02 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Rules, the Budget, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB6005 (Related) 2020-02-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SB1688 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB2860 (Related) 2019-11-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4796 (Related) 2020-10-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8527 (Related) 2020-10-02 - Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, the Judiciary, Oversight and Reform, House Administration, Rules, the Budget, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Civil actions and liability
Competition and antitrust
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Hospital care
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Right of privacy
State and local finance
Tax-exempt organizations
Civil actions and liability
Competition and antitrust
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Hospital care
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Right of privacy
State and local finance
Tax-exempt organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8098/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8098/BILLS-116hr8098ih.pdf |