US HB8099 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on August 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend titles 10 and 14, United States Code, to include certain diversity-related requirements for the Armed Forces and the Coast Guard, and for other purposes.
Title
Diversity in Defense Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] |
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] |
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2020-08-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-08-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB7289 (Related) 2020-06-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
SB4660 (Same As) 2020-09-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB7289 (Related) 2020-06-22 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
SB4660 (Same As) 2020-09-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Armed forces and national security
Cancer
Congressional oversight
Crimes against property
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Defense
Employee hiring
Employment and training programs
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hate crimes
Health technology, devices, supplies
Higher education
Intergovernmental relations
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military facilities and property
Military law
Military personnel and dependents
Military readiness
Minority employment
Performance measurement
Racial and ethnic relations
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Violent crime
Women's employment
Women's health
Armed forces and national security
Cancer
Congressional oversight
Crimes against property
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Defense
Employee hiring
Employment and training programs
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hate crimes
Health technology, devices, supplies
Higher education
Intergovernmental relations
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military facilities and property
Military law
Military personnel and dependents
Military readiness
Minority employment
Performance measurement
Racial and ethnic relations
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Violent crime
Women's employment
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8099/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8099/BILLS-116hr8099ih.pdf |