US HB8103 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on August 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes within the responsibilities of the Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Security Agency hunting for and identifying threats and vulnerabilities within federal information systems. The Department of Homeland Security shall issue a binding operational directive to implement this change.
Title
Protecting Federal Networks Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Green [R-TN] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2020-08-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB8309 (Related) 2020-09-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB8309 (Related) 2020-09-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Government operations and politics
Homeland security
Computers and information technology
Government operations and politics
Homeland security
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8103/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8103/BILLS-116hr8103ih.pdf |