US HB8124 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 18, United States Code, to provide for transportation and subsistence for criminal justice defendants, and for other purposes.
Title
Criminal Judicial Administration Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] | Rep. Martha Roby [R-AL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-10-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-10-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5142) |
2020-10-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8124. |
2020-10-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5142-5143) |
2020-10-01 | House | Ms. Garcia (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 434. |
2020-09-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-534. |
2020-09-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported. |
2020-09-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-08-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-08-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Judicial procedure and administration
Jurisdiction and venue
Legal fees and court costs
Transportation costs
Travel and tourism
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Judicial procedure and administration
Jurisdiction and venue
Legal fees and court costs
Transportation costs
Travel and tourism