US HB8128 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires various agencies to explore the use of emerging technologies in the context of consumer products and safety. First, the Consumer Product and Safety Commission must consult with relevant stakeholders, such as data scientists and product manufacturers, and use artificial intelligence in a pilot program for a least one of the following processes: (1) tracking trends in injuries involving consumer products, (2) identifying consumer product hazards, (3) monitoring the sale of recalled consumer products, or (4) identifying consumer products that do not meet specified importation requirements related to product safety. Additionally, the Department of Commerce must consult with the Federal Trade Commission (FTC) and other relevant agencies to study potential applications of blockchain technology (i.e., the technology that supports digital currencies such as Bitcoin), including the use of such technology to address fraud and other unfair or deceptive practices. Finally, the FTC must report on its efforts to address unfair or deceptive trade practices related to digital tokens (i.e., transferable units of a digital currency).
Title
Consumer Safety Technology Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] |
Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2020-09-29 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H4988-4989) |
2020-09-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. |
2020-09-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8128. |
2020-09-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4988-4990) |
2020-09-29 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 445. |
2020-09-29 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-545. |
2020-09-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-08-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-08-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8153 (Related) 2020-09-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Commerce
Competition and antitrust
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Currency
Digital media
Financial services and investments
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Product safety and quality
Public-private cooperation
Retail and wholesale trades
Trade restrictions
Commerce
Competition and antitrust
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Currency
Digital media
Financial services and investments
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Product safety and quality
Public-private cooperation
Retail and wholesale trades
Trade restrictions