US HB8162 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses the sense of Congress that the Department of Education (ED) should expand the allowable uses for subgrants provided under the 21st Century Community Learning Centers Program for the 2020-2021 school year. Specifically, ED should carry out the exceptions published in a notice on September 3, 2020, by allowing eligible entities (e.g., local educational agencies and community-based organizations) that are awarded program subgrants for community learning centers to use these subgrants to (1) carry out activities that advance student academic achievement and support student success, regardless of whether such activities are conducted in person, virtually, during school hours, or when school is in session; and (2) provide in-person care during the regular school day and when full-time in-person instruction is not available to students. (Currently, the program only supports academic enrichment opportunities for children during non-school hours or periods when school is not in session.)
Title
21st Century Community Learning Centers Coronavirus Relief Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] |
Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] |
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2020-09-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4452) |
2020-09-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8162. |
2020-09-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4452-4455) |
2020-09-16 | House | Ms. Wild moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2020-09-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
Child care and development
Community life and organization
Education
Education programs funding
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Child care and development
Community life and organization
Education
Education programs funding
Educational facilities and institutions
Elementary and secondary education
Government information and archives
Teaching, teachers, curricula