US HB8192 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-0)
Status: Introduced on September 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-08 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-08 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making emergency supplemental appropriations for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2020, and for other purposes.
Title
COVID Community Care Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-09-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-09-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2193 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-160. (TXT | PDF)
SB4941 (Same As) 2020-12-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB4941 (Same As) 2020-12-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Appropriations
Blood and blood diseases
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Community life and organization
Department of Health and Human Services
Education programs funding
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Minority health
Right of privacy
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Unemployment
Worker safety and health
Blood and blood diseases
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Community life and organization
Department of Health and Human Services
Education programs funding
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Executive agency funding and structure
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Higher education
Indian social and development programs
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Minority health
Right of privacy
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Unemployment
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8192/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8192/BILLS-116hr8192ih.pdf |