US HB8225 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 18, United States Code, to prohibit certain types of fraud in the provision of immigration services, and for other purposes.
Title
Fight Notario Fraud Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL] | Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-10-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-10-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5149-5150) |
2020-10-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8225. |
2020-10-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5149-5151) |
2020-10-01 | House | Ms. Bass moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 433. |
2020-09-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-533. |
2020-09-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2020-09-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Assault and harassment offenses
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Justice
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Immigrant health and welfare
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Lawyers and legal services
Assault and harassment offenses
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Justice
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Immigrant health and welfare
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Lawyers and legal services