US HB8229 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Small Business Administration (SBA) to authorize its Office of Hearings and Appeals (OHA) to decide all appeals from formal protest determinations in connection with the status of a HUBZone small business. A HUBZone small business is a small business in a historically underutilized business zone. Currently, HUBZone status appeals are the responsibility of the Office of Government Contracting and Business Development. The bill would place HUBZone status appeals within the purview of the OHA alongside other SBA programs such as the Service-Disabled Veteran-Owned Small Business program and the Women-Owned Small Business program.
Title
Parity for HUBZone Appeals Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2020-12-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6078) |
2020-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8229. |
2020-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6078-6079) |
2020-12-03 | House | Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2020-09-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2020-09-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Commerce
Economic development
Judicial review and appeals
Small Business Administration
Commerce
Economic development
Judicial review and appeals
Small Business Administration