US HB823 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 179.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Colorado Outdoor Recreation and Economy Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorado Outdoor Recreation and Economy Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-04HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 179.
2019-10-04HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-226.
2019-06-26HouseSubcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
2019-06-26HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 15.
2019-06-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-26HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
2019-04-02HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
2019-02-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-01-28HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB241 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Air quality
Alternative and renewable resources
Animal and plant health
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Coal
Colorado
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Hunting and fishing
Infrastructure development
Insects
Intergovernmental relations
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Livestock
Mining
Motor vehicles
Oil and gas
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pedestrians and bicycling
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways
Water storage
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback