US HB8231 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Defense to ensure that removal and remedial actions relating to PFOS or PFOA contamination result in levels meeting or exceeding certain standards, and for other purposes.
Title
To direct the Secretary of Defense to ensure that removal and remedial actions relating to PFOS or PFOA contamination result in levels meeting or exceeding certain standards, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2020-09-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-09-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-09-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-09-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Environmental health
Environmental regulatory procedures
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health information and medical records
National Guard and reserves
Water quality
Water use and supply
Environmental health
Environmental regulatory procedures
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health information and medical records
National Guard and reserves
Water quality
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8231/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8231/BILLS-116hr8231ih.pdf |