US HB8247 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Veterans COMPACT Act of 2020 Veterans Comprehensive Prevention, Access to Care, and Treatment Act of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans COMPACT Act of 2020 Veterans Comprehensive Prevention, Access to Care, and Treatment Act of 2020

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-24SenateReceived in the Senate.
2020-09-23HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-09-23HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4763-4767)
2020-09-23HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8247.
2020-09-23HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4763-4770)
2020-09-23HouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2020-09-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-09-17HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2020-09-17HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-09-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2020-09-14HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2020-09-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB4154 (Related) 2019-08-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5324 (Related) 2020-03-10 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB7747 (Related) 2020-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2864 (Related) 2020-07-01 - Held at the desk.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback