US HB8260 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on September 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows employers a payroll tax credit in each calendar quarter of 50% of the their qualified workplace training expenses paid or incurred after March 12, 2020, and before January 21, 2021. The bill defines qualified workplace training expenses as employer expenses for education and training for the health and safety of employees in the workplace with respect to COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019), and the prevention of the spread of COVID-19 in the workplace.
Title
Businesses Preparing for a Better Tomorrow Act
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2020-09-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Subjects
Appropriations
Business education
Business expenses
Disability assistance
Employment taxes
Government trust funds
Health promotion and preventive care
Social security and elderly assistance
Taxation
Worker safety and health
Business education
Business expenses
Disability assistance
Employment taxes
Government trust funds
Health promotion and preventive care
Social security and elderly assistance
Taxation
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8260/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8260/BILLS-116hr8260ih.pdf |