US HB828 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - Became Public Law No: 116-43. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 25 Route 111 in Smithtown, New York, as the "Congressman Bill Carney Post Office". Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 25 Route 111 in Smithtown, New York, as the "Congressman Bill Carney Post Office."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 25 Route 111 in Smithtown, New York, as the "Congressman Bill Carney Post Office".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-21SenateBecame Public Law No: 116-43. (TXT | PDF)
2019-08-21SenateSigned by President.
2019-08-13SenatePresented to President.
2019-07-31SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-07-30SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5204)
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 88.
2019-05-15SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. Without written report.
2019-05-15SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2019-05-01SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2019-04-30HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-04-30HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3320)
2019-04-30HouseConsidered as unfinished business.
2019-04-30HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 828.
2019-04-30HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3320-3321)
2019-04-30HouseMs. Kelly (IL) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-03-26HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2019-03-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-01-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
2019-01-28HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback