US HB83 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Pending: House Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Pending: House Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act and the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010, effective at the beginning of FY2020. Provisions of law amended by those Acts are restored.
Title
Responsible Path to Full Obamacare Repeal Act
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, House Administration, Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, House Administration, Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, House Administration, Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, House Administration, Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, House Administration, Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, House Administration, Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, House Administration, Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Education and Labor, Natural Resources, the Judiciary, House Administration, Rules, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB185 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
HB2536 (Related) 2019-05-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
HB2536 (Related) 2019-05-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Subjects
Comprehensive health care
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Higher education
Student aid and college costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/83/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr83/BILLS-116hr83ih.pdf |