US HB8319 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-23 - Rule H. Res. 1129 passed House.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Continuing Appropriations Act, 2021 and Other Extensions Act This bill provides continuing FY2021 appropriations to federal agencies through December 11, 2020, and extends several programs. It is known as a continuing resolution (CR) and prevents a government shutdown that would otherwise occur if the FY2021 appropriations bills have not been enacted when FY2021 begins on October 1, 2020. The CR funds most programs and activities at the FY2020 levels with several exceptions that provide funding flexibility and additional appropriations to various programs. In addition, the bill extends several authorities and programs, including surface transportation programs; public health, Medicare, and Medicaid authorities and programs; several authorities related to veterans benefits; the National Flood Insurance Program; the Appalachian Regional Commission; the U.S. Parole Commission; the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program; and several authorities related to immigration. The bill also includes provisions that increase and expand U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services fees for providing premium processing services for certain immigration-related applications, and reauthorize a program that provides incentives (e.g., limitations on civil liability) for corporations to self-report antitrust violations to the Department of Justice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Continuing Appropriations Act, 2021 and Other Extensions Act

Sponsors

Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-23HouseRule H. Res. 1129 passed House.
2020-09-21HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1129 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4447, H.R. 6270 and H.R. 8319. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4447 under a structured rulee with 90 minutes of general debate. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 6270, under closed rule and H.R. 8319 under a closed rule.
2020-09-21HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-09-21HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-09-21HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR1129 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB3445 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB4434 (Related) 2019-09-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
HB7036 (Related) 2020-06-29 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 486.
HB7882 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB8078 (Related) 2020-08-21 - Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
HB8089 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Received in the Senate.
SB850 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
SB2273 (Related) 2019-07-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB3377 (Related) 2020-06-29 - Held at the desk.
SB4346 (Related) 2020-07-30 - Held at the desk.
HB8337 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-159.
SB4674 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects

Administrative remedies
Aging
Agricultural marketing and promotion
Agricultural prices, subsidies, credit
Appalachian Regional Commission
Appropriations
Asia
Aviation and airports
Bankruptcy
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Census and government statistics
Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC)
Child care and development
Child health
Coast guard
Community life and organization
Competition and antitrust
Congressional agencies
Congressional operations and organization
Congressional oversight
Corporation for National and Community Service
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Defense spending
Department of Agriculture
Department of Commerce
Department of Defense
Department of Energy
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Homeland Security
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Department of State
Department of the Interior
Department of Transportation
Department of Veterans Affairs
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Disability assistance
Disaster relief and insurance
District of Columbia
Drug therapy
Economics and public finance
Education programs funding
Electric power generation and transmission
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee leave
Environmental health
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Floods and storm protection
Food assistance and relief
Foreign labor
Forests, forestry, trees
General Services Administration
Georgia
Government Accountability Office (GAO)
Government corporations and government-sponsored enterprises
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Grain
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Higher education
Home and outpatient care
Homelessness and emergency shelter
House of Representatives
Housing and community development funding
Housing finance and home ownership
Hunting and fishing
Immigration status and procedures
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Internet and video services
Judges
Land transfers
Library of Congress
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Low- and moderate-income housing
Marine and inland water transportation
Medicaid
Medical education
Medical research
Medicare
Members of Congress
Mental health
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
National Archives and Records Administration
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Nursing
Nutrition and diet
Office of Personnel Management (OPM)
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pest management
Philippines
Physical fitness and lifestyle
Preschool education
Prescription drugs
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
Public transit
Railroads
Research administration and funding
Roads and highways
Sales and excise taxes
Sex and reproductive health
Small business
Small Business Administration
Specialized courts
Tennessee
Transportation costs
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' medical care
Water quality
Water resources funding
Water use and supply

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback