US HB8345 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 88-32)
Status: Introduced on September 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Aviation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To provide support for air carrier workers, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Air Carrier Worker Support Extension Act of 2020

Sponsors

Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX]
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]
Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Don Young [R-AK]
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]
Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]
Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]
Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU]
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]
Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]
Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX]Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK]Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. Christopher Jacobs [R-NY]
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]
Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]
Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]
Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]
Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-23HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
2020-09-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-09-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2020-09-22HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB4634 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB4774 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 563.
HB8504 (Related) 2020-10-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback