US HB835 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Passed on December 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-206. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Passed on December 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-206. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes it unlawful to knowingly influence (or attempt or conspire to influence) a major international sports competition by use of a prohibited substance or prohibited method. A violator is subject to criminal penalties—a fine, a prison term of up to 10 years, or both—and mandatory restitution. Additionally, property may be seized and forfeited to the U.S. government if it was used or intended to be used to commit an offense or traceable to the proceeds in connection with an offense.
Title
Rodchenkov Anti-Doping Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] |
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] |
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] |
Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] |
Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-206. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-12-04 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-11-24 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-11-17 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6693) |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 509. |
2020-08-06 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-247. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2019-10-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-22 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8340) |
2019-10-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 835. |
2019-10-22 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8339-8345) |
2019-10-22 | House | Ms. Jackson Lee moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 200. |
2019-10-22 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2019-10-22 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-251, Part I. |
2019-10-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-15 | House | Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged. |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-29 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1271) |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB259 (Same As) 2019-01-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Athletes
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
International law and treaties
Jurisdiction and venue
Olympic games
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
International law and treaties
Jurisdiction and venue
Olympic games