US HB839 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the network components of the National Multimodal Freight Network (NMFN). Specifically, the bill requires the interim NMFN to include public ports of the United States that have a total annual cargo value of at least $1 billion, and the final NMFN to include all specified interim network components when the Department of Transportation designates or redesignates the network.
Title
National Multimodal Freight Network Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7095 (Related) 2020-06-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HR1028 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HR1028 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/839/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr839/BILLS-116hr839ih.pdf |