US HB8408 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses certain safety standards relating to the aircraft certification process. Among other things, the bill requires the Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) to direct U.S. aircraft and aerospace industry manufacturers to adopt safety management systems consistent with international standards and practices; convene an expert panel to review organizations that design and produce transport airplanes and make recommendations for improvements; require manufacturers to disclose to the FAA certain safety-critical information related to an aircraft; conduct a comprehensive review of each manufacturing Organization Designation Authorization holder's capability to meet FAA regulations based on the holder's organizational structures, requirements applicable to officers and employees, and safety culture; establish an appeal process to review decisions regarding a manufacturer's compliance with applicable design regulations; revise and improve its process of issuing amended type certificates for modifying an aircraft; initiate a call to action safety review of pilot certification standards in order to bring stakeholders together to share lessons learned, best practices, and implement actions to address any safety issues identified; and conduct an evaluation of tools and methods that support the better integration of human factors and system safety assessments of aircraft flight deck and flight control systems into the FAA's certification process.
Title
Aircraft Certification Reform and Accountability Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2020-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5835-5844) |
2020-11-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8408. |
2020-11-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5835-5847) |
2020-11-17 | House | Mr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 477. |
2020-11-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-579. |
2020-09-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-30 | House | Subcommittee on Aviation Discharged. |
2020-09-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2020-09-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2020-09-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8403 (Related) 2020-09-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Advisory bodies
Aviation and airports
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Department of Transportation
Employee hiring
Employment and training programs
Federal officials
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intellectual property
Judicial review and appeals
Licensing and registrations
Manufacturing
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Wages and earnings
Advisory bodies
Aviation and airports
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Department of Transportation
Employee hiring
Employment and training programs
Federal officials
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Intellectual property
Judicial review and appeals
Licensing and registrations
Manufacturing
Performance measurement
Public contracts and procurement
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Wages and earnings