US HB8438 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the President's authority to impose sanctions related to Belarus to include activities surrounding the disputed 2020 Belarusian presidential election and subsequent government crackdown. The bill also expands authorized assistance to Belarus. The President may impose visa-blocking sanctions on any alien who (1) is a member of the Central Election Commission of Belarus or assisted in the manipulation of the August 9, 2020, presidential election, (2) is a government official responsible for the crackdown on independent media, (3) is an official of the Union State (an international organization consisting of Belarus and Russia), or (4) is a Russian individual who has significantly participated in the crackdown on the press or human rights abuses related to political repression in Belarus. (The President already has authority to impose such sanctions on certain aliens, such as senior leaders in the government of Belarus.) The bill also expands authorized assistance related to Belarus to include assistance to (1) counter internet censorship and surveillance technology, (2) support the work of women advocating for freedom and human rights, and (3) support political refugees fleeing the crackdown in Belarus.
Title
Belarus Democracy, Human Rights, and Sovereignty Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] |
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] |
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2020-11-18 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-18 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5915-5917) |
2020-11-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8438. |
2020-11-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5915-5920) |
2020-11-18 | House | Mr. Espaillat moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-10-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-10-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-09-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-09-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-09-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-09-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Belarus
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Canada
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Europe
European Union
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Foreign property
Government lending and loan guarantees
Historical and cultural resources
Human rights
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International organizations and cooperation
Internet and video services
Military operations and strategy
National symbols
News media and reporting
Protest and dissent
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Russia
Sanctions
Small business
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Subversive activities
U.S. and foreign investments
United Kingdom
Visas and passports
Women's rights
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Canada
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Detention of persons
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Europe
European Union
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international corporations
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Foreign property
Government lending and loan guarantees
Historical and cultural resources
Human rights
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International organizations and cooperation
Internet and video services
Military operations and strategy
National symbols
News media and reporting
Protest and dissent
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Religion
Russia
Sanctions
Small business
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Subversive activities
U.S. and foreign investments
United Kingdom
Visas and passports
Women's rights