US HB8497 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on October 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the Small Business Administration from providing aid, counsel, or assistance to a small business concern that (1) is headquartered in China, or (2) has more than 25% of voting stock owned by citizens of China.
Title
Preventing SBA Assistance from Going to China Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK] | Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA] |
Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2020-10-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB595 (Related) 2019-01-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
SB75 (Related) 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
HB8666 (Related) 2020-10-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
SB75 (Related) 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
HB8666 (Related) 2020-10-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Asia
China
Commerce
Corporate finance and management
Foreign and international corporations
Securities
Small business
Small Business Administration
U.S. and foreign investments
Asia
China
Commerce
Corporate finance and management
Foreign and international corporations
Securities
Small business
Small Business Administration
U.S. and foreign investments
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8497/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8497/BILLS-116hr8497ih.pdf |