US HB85 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes funding for a U.S.-Mexico border barrier and revises how border patrol agents are compensated for overtime. The Department of the Treasury shall set up an account for funding the design, construction, and maintenance of the barrier. The funds are appropriated only for that purpose and for vehicles and equipment for border patrol agents. For each fiscal year, financial assistance to a country shall be reduced by $2,000 for each citizen or national of that country apprehended for illegally entering the United States through its southern border. The reduced amount shall be transferred to the border barrier account. The Department of State may opt not to reduce amounts appropriated to Mexico for various military and law enforcement-related activities. establishes a 5% fee on foreign remittance transfers and increases the fee for the arrival/departure I-94 form for various aliens entering the United States, with part of the fees to go into the border barrier account. By December 31, 2019, DHS shall (1) take all actions necessary, including constructing barriers, to prevent illegal crossings along the U.S.-Mexico barrier; and (2) achieve operational control over all U.S. international borders. The bill changes how border patrol agents receive overtime pay when working up to 100 hours in a two-week period. For hours worked above 80, an agent shall receive at least 150% of the agent's regular hourly rate.
Title
Fund and Complete the Border Wall Act
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] | Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] |
Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] |
Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX] |
Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Tom Tiffany [R-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Foreign Affairs, Financial Services, Education and Labor, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Foreign Affairs, Financial Services, Education and Labor, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Foreign Affairs, Financial Services, Education and Labor, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Foreign Affairs, Financial Services, Education and Labor, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Foreign Affairs, Financial Services, Education and Labor, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Foreign Affairs, Financial Services, Education and Labor, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, the Judiciary, Foreign Affairs, Financial Services, Education and Labor, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3199 (Related) 2020-01-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Building construction
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Foreign aid and international relief
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government trust funds
Immigration
International monetary system and foreign exchange
Mexico
User charges and fees
Building construction
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Foreign aid and international relief
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government trust funds
Immigration
International monetary system and foreign exchange
Mexico
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/85/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr85/BILLS-116hr85ih.pdf |