US HB8501 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of the Treasury to regulate tax return preparers, including by sanctioning preparers for incompetence and disreputable behavior and by establishing minimum competency standards for preparers.
Title
TEAMS Act Tax-preparer Enforcement, Accountability, and Minimum Standards Act
Sponsors
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2020-10-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3157 (Related) 2019-06-06 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB3330 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3466 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1138 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1192 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3330 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3466 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1138 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1192 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Congressional oversight
Department of the Treasury
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
State and local taxation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Administrative remedies
Congressional oversight
Department of the Treasury
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Intergovernmental relations
State and local government operations
State and local taxation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8501/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8501/BILLS-116hr8501ih.pdf |