US HB8504 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on October 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Aviation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Aviation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To extend the Payroll Support Program, and for other purposes.
Title
Payroll Support Program Extension Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] |
Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2020-10-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-10-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-10-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-10-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8345 (Related) 2020-09-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
SB4634 (Related) 2020-09-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB4774 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 563.
SB4634 (Related) 2020-09-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB4774 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 563.
Subjects
Appropriations
Aviation and airports
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Labor-management relations
Rural conditions and development
Securities
Small towns
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Unemployment
Wages and earnings
Aviation and airports
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Congressional oversight
Corporate finance and management
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Labor-management relations
Rural conditions and development
Securities
Small towns
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Unemployment
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8504/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8504/BILLS-116hr8504ih.pdf |