US HB8530 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates energy opportunity zones for areas that are within 120 miles of a nuclear or coal power plant used to generate electricity that has ceased operations or is scheduled to cease operations within 6 years, or areas that can demonstrate how changes in the nuclear or coal economy have resulted or may result in job losses. The bill modifies or extends the new energy efficient home tax credit, the nonbusiness energy property tax credit, the investment tax credit, and the tax credit for production of electricity, and establishes a new tax credit for offshore wind and energy storage. The bill also extends through 2050 the tax deduction for energy efficient commercial buildings.
Title
Energy Opportunity Zones Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2020-10-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4506 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB4646 (Related) 2019-10-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2588 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2595 (Related) 2019-10-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4646 (Related) 2019-10-11 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2588 (Related) 2019-09-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2595 (Related) 2019-10-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Alternative and renewable resources
Building construction
Business investment and capital
Department of the Treasury
Economic development
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental technology
Great Lakes
Income tax credits
Lighting, heating, cooling
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Nuclear power
Oil and gas
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Taxation
Alternative and renewable resources
Building construction
Business investment and capital
Department of the Treasury
Economic development
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental technology
Great Lakes
Income tax credits
Lighting, heating, cooling
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Nuclear power
Oil and gas
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8530/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8530/BILLS-116hr8530ih.pdf |