US HB854 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 137-22-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Peace Corps Commemorative Foundation to establish a commemorative work on federal land in the District of Columbia to commemorate the formation of the Peace Corps and the ideals of world peace and friendship upon which it was founded.
Title
To authorize the Peace Corps Commemorative Foundation to establish a commemorative work in the District of Columbia and its environs, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-04 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2011-03-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. |
2011-03-01 | House | Referred to House Budget |
2011-03-01 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2011-03-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2011-03-01 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1394) |
Same As/Similar To
SB1421 (Related) 2012-12-31 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
District of Columbia
Government operations and politics
Monuments and memorials
National and community service
Peace Corps
District of Columbia
Government operations and politics
Monuments and memorials
National and community service
Peace Corps
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/854/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr854/BILLS-112hr854ih.pdf |