US HB854 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of State to report to Congress a long term strategy for coordinating the provision of humanitarian assistance to Venezuelans both in Venezuela and in other parts of the Western Hemisphere and authorizes the President to provide humanitarian aid to such individuals. The strategy shall cover topics including how to provide public health commodities, food, and technical assistance. It shall also describe (1) current and anticipated challenges to distributing humanitarian assistance in Venezuela and elsewhere, and (2) how the United States is coordinating efforts with other countries. The Government Accountability Office shall report to Congress on the impact of U.S. assistance for Venezuelans throughout the Western Hemisphere.
Title
Humanitarian Assistance to the Venezuelan People Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL] | Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL] | Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] |
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2019-03-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-03-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2769-2770) |
2019-03-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 854. |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2769-2771) |
2019-03-25 | House | Mr. Sires moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules. |
2019-03-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-01-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Caribbean area
Congressional oversight
Food assistance and relief
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Multilateral development programs
Nutrition and diet
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID)
United Nations
Venezuela
World health
Congressional oversight
Food assistance and relief
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Latin America
Multilateral development programs
Nutrition and diet
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID)
United Nations
Venezuela
World health