US HB8632 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-17 - Committee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Commerce, acting through the Administrator of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, to provide for ocean-based climate solutions to reduce carbon emissions and global warming; to make coastal communities more resilient; and to provide for the conservation and restoration of ocean and coastal habitats, biodiversity, and marine mammal and fish populations; and for other purposes.
Title
Ocean-Based Climate Solutions Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-17 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2020-10-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2020-10-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2020-10-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, House Administration, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-10-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, House Administration, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-10-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, House Administration, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-10-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, House Administration, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-10-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, House Administration, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-10-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, House Administration, Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-10-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB729 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB1237 (Related) 2019-06-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB1314 (Related) 2019-10-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 183.
HB1716 (Related) 2019-06-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB3115 (Related) 2019-11-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 257.
HB7387 (Related) 2020-11-17 - Committee Hearings Held.
HB7450 (Related) 2020-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
HB8253 (Related) 2020-11-17 - Committee Hearings Held.
HB8627 (Related) 2020-11-17 - Committee Hearings Held.
HB8750 (Related) 2020-11-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB8795 (Related) 2020-11-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
SB1730 (Related) 2020-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 631.
SB4093 (Related) 2020-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB1237 (Related) 2019-06-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB1314 (Related) 2019-10-11 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 183.
HB1716 (Related) 2019-06-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB3115 (Related) 2019-11-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 257.
HB7387 (Related) 2020-11-17 - Committee Hearings Held.
HB7450 (Related) 2020-07-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
HB8253 (Related) 2020-11-17 - Committee Hearings Held.
HB8627 (Related) 2020-11-17 - Committee Hearings Held.
HB8750 (Related) 2020-11-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
HB8795 (Related) 2020-11-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
SB1730 (Related) 2020-12-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 631.
SB4093 (Related) 2020-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Air quality
Alaska
Alternative and renewable resources
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Aquaculture
Aquatic ecology
Arctic and polar regions
Atmospheric science and weather
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Ecology
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Energy research
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Floods and storm protection
Florida
Forests, forestry, trees
Geography and mapping
Indian lands and resources rights
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International law and treaties
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Mining
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Noise pollution
Pacific Ocean
Seafood
U.S. territories and protectorates
Unemployment
Water quality
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Alaska
Alternative and renewable resources
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Aquaculture
Aquatic ecology
Arctic and polar regions
Atmospheric science and weather
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Ecology
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Energy research
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Floods and storm protection
Florida
Forests, forestry, trees
Geography and mapping
Indian lands and resources rights
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International law and treaties
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Mining
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Noise pollution
Pacific Ocean
Seafood
U.S. territories and protectorates
Unemployment
Water quality
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8632/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8632/BILLS-116hr8632ih.pdf |