US HB8665 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to, within 30 days, establish a new tribal priority window for the 2.5 gigahertz band, through which tribes in rural areas may apply for unassigned spectrum. The new window is subject to the same terms and conditions as the tribal priority window that was adopted by the FCC on July 10, 2019, and that closed on September 2, 2020.
Title
Extending Tribal Broadband Priority Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] |
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-10-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4809 (Same As) 2020-10-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Indian lands and resources rights
Internet and video services
Native Americans
Radio spectrum allocation
Rural conditions and development
Telephone and wireless communication
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Federal Communications Commission (FCC)
Indian lands and resources rights
Internet and video services
Native Americans
Radio spectrum allocation
Rural conditions and development
Telephone and wireless communication
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8665/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8665/BILLS-116hr8665ih.pdf |