US HB8698 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-27 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-27 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reaffirms the availability of discrimination claims under specified civil rights statutes based on disparate impact. Specifically, the bill restores and expands protections of the Civil Rights Act of 1964, the Fair Housing Act of 1968, the Age Discrimination Act of 1975, the Rehabilitation Act of 1973, and Title IX of the Education Amendments of 1972. The bill, among other things prohibits actions which have a discriminatory effect, regardless of any discriminatory intent; prohibits the use of compelled arbitration clauses; eliminates qualified immunity for government employees and prohibits racial and gender profiling in police investigations; awards victims of disparate impact discrimination compensation and attorney's fees; and defines sex for purposes of civil rights to include sexual orientation, pregnancy, gender identity, sex stereotypes, or any sex-related traits.
Title
Justice for All Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-10-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2020-10-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1423 (Related) 2019-09-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB2687 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB610 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB2687 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB610 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Age discrimination
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Assault and harassment offenses
Civil actions and liability
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Disability and health-based discrimination
Elementary and secondary education
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Evidence and witnesses
Government liability
Higher education
Housing discrimination
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Legal fees and court costs
Racial and ethnic relations
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Alternative dispute resolution, mediation, arbitration
Assault and harassment offenses
Civil actions and liability
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Disability and health-based discrimination
Elementary and secondary education
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Evidence and witnesses
Government liability
Higher education
Housing discrimination
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Legal fees and court costs
Racial and ethnic relations
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8698/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8698/BILLS-116hr8698ih.pdf |