US HB870 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2025 the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Historic Preservation Fund Grant Program.
Title
To reauthorize the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Historic Preservation program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB280 (Same As) 2019-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Educational facilities and institutions
Higher education
Historic sites and heritage areas
Minority education
Public lands and natural resources
Higher education
Historic sites and heritage areas
Minority education
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/870/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr870/BILLS-116hr870ih.pdf |