US HB8802 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-20 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes new tax credits and revises existing credits and deductions to protect the hospitality and restaurant industries. Specifically, the bill allows a convention and trade show restart tax credit for (1) the costs of participation in a convention, seminar, or similar meeting, a business meeting, or a trade show that takes place after 2020; and (2) the costs of reopening an entertainment facility closed due to the COVID-19 (i.e., coronavirus disease 2019) pandemic. It also allows a business-related tax credit for the costs of reopening restaurants or food service businesses forced to close down or reduce operations due to COVID-19. The bill modifies, and increases the rate of, the tax credit for the retention of employees for an employer whose business has been affected by a disaster or public health emergency. It also repeals the increased limitations on the tax deduction for meals and entertainment expenses enacted in 2017. Finally, the bill allows individual taxpayers a new tax credit for travel expenses relating to entertainment activities occurring in the United States between January 1, 2021, and December 31, 2023.
Title
Hospitality and Commerce Job Recovery Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] | Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2020-11-20 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H6007-6008) |
2020-11-20 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4807 (Related) 2020-10-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Business expenses
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Employment taxes
Food industry and services
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health care costs and insurance
Income tax credits
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Marketing and advertising
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
State and local government operations
Tax-exempt organizations
Taxation
Transportation costs
Travel and tourism
Wages and earnings
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee benefits and pensions
Employment taxes
Food industry and services
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health care costs and insurance
Income tax credits
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Marketing and advertising
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
State and local government operations
Tax-exempt organizations
Taxation
Transportation costs
Travel and tourism
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8802/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8802/BILLS-116hr8802ih.pdf |