US HB884 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-17)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the definition of "physician," for purposes of the Medicare program, to include a clinical psychologist with respect to the furnishing of qualified psychologist services.
Title
Medicare Mental Health Access Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-01-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2772 (Same As) 2019-11-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/884/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr884/BILLS-116hr884ih.pdf |