US HB886 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Continuity of Education for Military Retired Dependents Act This bill authorizes the Department of Defense (DOD) to permit dependents of retired members of the Armed Forces who reside on military installations to attend DOD-provided elementary or secondary schools if DOD determines that appropriate educational programs are not available through a local educational agency.
Title
Continuity of Education for Military Retired Dependents Act
Sponsors
Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S.Amdt. 1003 to H.R. 2810 (National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018) (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Elementary and secondary education
Military personnel and dependents
Elementary and secondary education
Military personnel and dependents