US HB886 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 99-37)
Status: Passed on August 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 116-153. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 99-37)
Status: Passed on August 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-08 - Became Public Law No: 116-153. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Justice to establish a Veterans Treatment Court Program to provide grants and technical assistance for state, local, and tribal governments to develop and maintain veterans treatment courts.
Title
Veteran Treatment Court Coordination Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-08 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-153. (TXT | PDF) |
2020-08-08 | House | Signed by President. |
2020-07-28 | House | Presented to President. |
2020-07-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-07-20 | House | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H3110) |
2020-07-20 | House | Mr. Cicilline asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table the bill, H.R. 886, and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H3110) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S262) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.1283 Amendment SA 1283 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.1283 Amendment SA 1283 proposed by Senator Moran for Senator McSally. (consideration: CR S262; text: CR S262) In the nature of a substitute. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S262) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-10-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8489) |
2019-10-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 886. |
2019-10-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8489-8491) |
2019-10-28 | House | Ms. Bass moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 207. |
2019-10-28 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 116-259. |
2019-10-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-10-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-15 | House | Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Discharged. |
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-01-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2774 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Judicial procedure and administration
Law enforcement administration and funding
State and local courts
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' medical care
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Judicial procedure and administration
Law enforcement administration and funding
State and local courts
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Veterans' medical care