US HB8871 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Pending: House Energy And Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for an emergency increase in Federal funding to State Medicaid programs for expenditures on home and community-based services.
Title
COVID HCBS Relief Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. John Larson [D-CT] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] |
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] |
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2020-12-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB925 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB8406 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4800 (Related) 2020-11-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 581.
SB4957 (Same As) 2020-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HB8406 (Related) 2020-09-29 - Referred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committees on the Budget, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB4800 (Related) 2020-11-09 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 581.
SB4957 (Same As) 2020-12-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Allied health services
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Community life and organization
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee hiring
Employee leave
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Home and outpatient care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Mental health
Nursing
State and local government operations
Transportation costs
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Community life and organization
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Employee hiring
Employee leave
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government studies and investigations
Health
Health facilities and institutions
Health personnel
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Home and outpatient care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Medicaid
Mental health
Nursing
State and local government operations
Transportation costs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/8871/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr8871/BILLS-116hr8871ih.pdf |